+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 484.
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 31, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 35, Nays: 7.) To Senate. In Senate. To enrollment.
On May 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Placed on General File. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. Exemption effective.
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 179.) Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Senator Dina Neal
Type:
Primary Sponsor