+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor. Approved by the Governor. Chapter 24.
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To enrollment.
On May 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
On May 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On May 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. Preamble adopted, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 607.) To printer.
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Prefiled. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (40)
Type:
Primary Sponsor