+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 276.
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assembly Amendment Nos. 761 and 895 concurred in. To enrollment.
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate.
On May 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 895.) To printer.
On May 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 761.) To printer.
On March 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Vacant: 1.) To Assembly.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor