+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 339.
On May 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assembly Amendment No. 726 concurred in. To enrollment.
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate.
On May 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
On May 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 726.) To printer.
On May 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On April 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 96.) To printer.
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Prefiled. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor