+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 491.
On June 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- To enrollment.
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assembly Amendment No. 964 concurred in.
- In Senate.
On June 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 27, Nays: 14, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
- Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 964.) To printer.
- Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On May 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.
- In Assembly.
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.) To Assembly.
- From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 847.) To printer.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- To committee.
- Exemption effective.
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 367.)
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and re-refer to Committee on Finance.
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
June 3, 2013: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 14
May 28, 2013: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 8
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor