+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
On April 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor