+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor. (Return to 2017 Session)
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- To enrollment.
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate.
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- To Senate.
On May 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 25, Nays: 17.)
On May 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time.
On April 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 11, Nays: 9, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 87.) To printer.
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor