+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chapter 59.
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To enrollment.
On May 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
On May 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On May 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Senate Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor