+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 302.
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assembly Amendment No. 853 concurred in. To enrollment.
On May 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate.
On May 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 4.) To Senate.
On May 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 853.) To printer.
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 86.) To printer. From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 18, Nays: 2, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor