+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 237.
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To enrollment.
On May 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 1, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On May 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
- In Assembly.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 381.) To printer.
- Placed on Second Reading File.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
June 1, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 20
June 1, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 18
May 19, 2015: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 5
May 18, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 1
April 21, 2015: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsor
Government Affairs
Type:
Primary Sponsor