+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor. Approved by the Governor. Chapter 451.
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To enrollment.
On June 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 37, Nays: 5.) To Senate.
On June 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
On June 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Taken from Second Reading File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1117.) To printer.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Notice of exemption.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Prefiled. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor