+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (5)
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 185.) To printer.
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor