+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 445.
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. In Senate. To enrollment.
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended.
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. Exemption effective.
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 94.) Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Senate Committee on Health and Human Services
Type:
Primary Sponsor