+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chapter 600.
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- To enrollment.
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- To printer. From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Fifth reprint.
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee. From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment Nos. 780 and 850 and further amend. Conference report adopted by Senate. Conference report adopted by Assembly. (Conference Amend. No. CA6.)
On June 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assembly Amendment Nos. 780 and 850 not concurred in. To Assembly. In Assembly. Assembly Amendment Nos. 780 and 850 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate.
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 850.) Dispensed with reprinting. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 12, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To printer. From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Fourth reprint. To Senate.
On May 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 780.) To printer.
On April 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 635.) Reprinting dispensed with. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.) To printer. From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 77.) To printer.
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.