+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 325.
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. In Senate. Assembly Amendment No. 837 concurred in. To enrollment.
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 837.) To printer. From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint. Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly. In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on General File. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 699.) Reprinting dispensed with. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To printer.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. Exemption effective.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Notice of eligibility for exemption. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 463.) Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Senate Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor