+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- (No further action taken.)
On May 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Notice of exemption.
On May 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
On May 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Without recommendation, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means.
On February 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Senate Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor