+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 5, 2023 in the Senate:
- No further consideration.
On June 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor. Returned to Senate with Governor's veto message. Made Special Order of Business for Monday, June 5, 2023, at 11:15 A.M.
On May 26, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 23, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 14.) To Senate. In Senate. To enrollment.
On May 22, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On May 19, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 26, 2023 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
On April 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 11, Nays: 10.) To Assembly.
On April 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
On April 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 483.) To printer.
On February 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor