+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor. Approved by the Governor. Chapter 491.
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 2.) To Senate. In Senate. To enrollment.
On June 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On June 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On June 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly. In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on General File. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 920.) Reprinting dispensed with. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To printer.
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. Exemption effective.
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 113.) Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and re-refer to Committee on Finance.
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Prefiled. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor