+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 82.
On May 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To enrollment.
On May 22, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 27, Nays: 14, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
On May 19, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On May 18, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 20, 2023 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
On April 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 15, Nays: 6.) To Assembly.
On April 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
On April 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On February 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor