+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 373.
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To enrollment.
On May 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
On May 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.
- In Assembly.
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
- Placed on General File.
- Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 984.) To printer.
- From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 18, Nays: None, Excused: 3.) To Assembly.
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Exemption effective.
- Notice of exemption.
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
On April 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 60.)
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (2)
May 30, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 41
May 27, 2015: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 18
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor