+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)
On May 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
On May 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On May 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 9.) To printer.
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Prefiled. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor