+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chapter 164.
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Absent: 1.) To Senate. In Senate. To enrollment.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On May 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 159.) To printer.
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor