+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
On May 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 661.) To printer.
On May 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On April 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 80.) To printer.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Prefiled. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.