+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- (No further action taken.)
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Waiver granted effective: April 17, 2015.
- Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 280.) To printer.
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. To committee.
- From printer.
On February 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor