+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chapter 161.
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To enrollment.
On May 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 15, Absent: 1.) To Senate.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On May 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 16, Nays: 5.) To Assembly.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 100.) To printer.
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor