+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 156.
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assembly Amendment No. 624 concurred in. To enrollment.
- In Senate.
On May 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 3.) To Senate.
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
On May 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
- Placed on Second Reading File.
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 624.) To printer.
On April 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
- In Assembly.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 71.) To printer.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 20, 2013: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 39
April 18, 2013: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 20
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor