+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 1.
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To enrollment.
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. In Assembly. Read first time. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
On November 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On November 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled. To printer.