+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- File No. 41.
On June 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. To enrollment.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted. Placed on Resolution File. Resolution read and adopted. To Assembly.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Resolution read. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
On April 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Resolution read and adopted, as amended. To Senate.
On April 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. Placed on Resolution File. Resolution read. Amended. (Amend. No. 509.) To printer.
On March 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Resolution read. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor