+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- File No. 31.
On May 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
On May 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Senate Amendment No. 803 concurred in. To enrollment.
On May 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 803.) To printer.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
On April 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
On April 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On April 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On March 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.