+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 25, 2023 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. To enrollment. Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State. File No. 25.
On May 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Resolution read. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 18, Nays: 3.) To Assembly.
On May 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Taken from Resolution File. Placed on Resolution File for next legislative day.
On May 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Taken from Resolution File. Placed on Resolution File for next legislative day.
On May 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Resolution read. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
On April 24, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Resolution read. Passed, as amended. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 37, Nays: 5.) To Senate.
On April 21, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Resolution File. Resolution read. Amended. (Amend. No. 484.) To printer.
On March 28, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 27, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Resolution read. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor