+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State. File No. 25.
On May 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. To enrollment.
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly.
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Without recommendation. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time.
On April 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
On April 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 33, Nays: 8, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
On April 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 454.) To printer.
On April 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On March 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor