+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- File No. 18.
- Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
On April 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. To enrollment.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
- Placed on Second Reading File.
- From committee: Do pass.
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
- In Senate.
On March 26, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
On March 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
- Placed on Second Reading File.
- From committee: Do pass.
On March 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.
+ − Votes (2)
April 3, 2013: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 21
March 26, 2013: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 41
+ − Sponsors (44)
Type:
Primary Sponsor