+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State. File No. 34.
On May 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate Amendment No. 836 concurred in. To enrollment.
On May 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly.
On May 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. Preamble adopted, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 836.) To printer.
On February 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To Senate. In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
On February 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Resolution read. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 34, Nays: 6, Excused: 2.) To printer.
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor