+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 43.
On May 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. To enrollment.
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
On April 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 38, Nays: None, Excused: 4.) To Senate.
On April 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 317.) To printer.
On April 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On March 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption. Read second time. Taken from General File. Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee.
On March 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On February 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To committee.
On February 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On February 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.