+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chapter 589.
On June 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. In Assembly. To enrollment.
On June 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
On June 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time.
On May 31, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass, as amended. Placed on General File. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee.
On April 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
On April 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 49.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On March 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On February 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To committee.
On January 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On January 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Assembly Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining
Type:
Primary Sponsor