+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 163.
On May 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. To enrollment.
On May 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly.
On May 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
- In Senate.
On April 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
On April 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 488.) To printer.
On April 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On February 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To committee.
On December 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On December 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (3)
May 17, 2015: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 1
April 20, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 42
March 11, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 41
+ − Sponsor
Government Affairs
Type:
Primary Sponsor