+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chapter 480.
On June 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly. In Assembly. To enrollment.
On June 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time.
On May 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
On May 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 910.) To printer.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Notice of exemption.
On February 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To committee.
On November 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On November 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Assembly Committee on Ways and Means
Type:
Primary Sponsor