+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
On April 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
- In Senate.
On April 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 24, Nays: 18.) To Senate.
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
On April 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 154.) To printer.
On April 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On February 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To committee.
On December 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On December 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
April 21, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 11
April 20, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 42
April 8, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 18
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor