+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 31, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas:Â 17, Nays:Â 4.) To Assembly. In Assembly. To enrollment.
On May 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time.
On May 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 777.) Dispensed with reprinting. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas:Â 31, Nays:Â 9, Excused:Â 2.) To printer. From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To Senate. In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
On May 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Withdrawn from committee. Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
On April 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Waiver granted effective: April 8, 2021.
On February 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- To committee.
On February 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On December 22, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On November 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Assembly Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections
Type:
Primary Sponsor