+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 96.
On May 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. To enrollment.
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
- In Senate.
On April 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
On March 31, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
On March 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 14.) To printer.
On March 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On February 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To committee.
On December 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On December 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
May 19, 2015: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 21
May 7, 2015: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 20
April 21, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 42
April 1, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 42
+ − Sponsor
Government Affairs
Type:
Primary Sponsor