+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 17.
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. To enrollment.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
- In Senate.
On March 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
On March 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On March 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On March 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On March 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On March 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On February 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To committee.
On December 27, 2012 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On December 20, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.
+ − Votes (2)
May 13, 2013: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 21
March 12, 2013: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 41
+ − Sponsor
Government Affairs
Type:
Primary Sponsor