+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chapter 544.
On June 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. In Assembly. To enrollment.
On June 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time.
On June 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. Placed on General File. Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
On May 31, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee. From committee: Do pass. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. Taken from General File. Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
On May 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Assembly Committee on Ways and Means
Type:
Primary Sponsor