+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 373.
On June 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. To enrollment.
On June 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On May 31, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time.
On May 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
On May 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On May 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Assembly Committee on Ways and Means
Type:
Primary Sponsor