+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chapter 587.
On June 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. In Assembly. To enrollment.
On June 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time.
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
On May 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 871.) To printer.
On May 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On April 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Assembly Committee on Ways and Means
Type:
Primary Sponsor