+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (5)
On June 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 607.
On June 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. In Assembly. To enrollment.
On June 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time.
On June 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. From printer. To committee. From committee: Do pass. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 3.) To Senate. In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.