+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor. Approved by the Governor. Chapter 446.
On June 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. In Assembly. To enrollment.
On June 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time.
On May 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
On May 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On May 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Assembly Committee on Ways and Means
Type:
Primary Sponsor