+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 98.
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. To enrollment.
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 4.) To Assembly.
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
On April 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
On April 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 30.) To printer.
On April 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.
On February 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- To committee.
On February 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On December 22, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On November 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Assembly Committee on Commerce and Labor
Type:
Primary Sponsor