+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 400.
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- To enrollment.
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate Amendment No. 729 concurred in.
On May 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
- From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
- Placed on Second Reading File.
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 729.) To printer.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
- In Senate.
On April 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
On April 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 532.) To printer.
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On February 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To committee.
On December 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On December 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
+ − Amendments (9)
+ − Votes (2)
May 19, 2015: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 21
April 17, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 40
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor