+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 510.
On June 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- To enrollment.
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
- Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate.
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
- Placed on Second Reading File.
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1074.) To printer.
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
- Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly.
- Senate Amendment No. 1074 concurred in.
On May 31, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
- Read first time. Referred to Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 1, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 40
June 1, 2015: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 20
+ − Sponsor
Legislative Operations and Elections
Type:
Primary Sponsor