+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 384.
On June 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. To enrollment.
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time.
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
On May 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time.
On April 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On April 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Assembly Committee on Ways and Means
Type:
Primary Sponsor